Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022