Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Motion expired
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 25; Ayes: 64 Nays: 22
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Remove Representative Gann as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|