Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1280 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3+SB1280 HFLR Page 1
4+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
5+2
6+3
7+4
8+5
9+6
10+7
11+8
12+9
13+10
14+11
15+12
16+13
17+14
18+15
19+16
20+17
21+18
22+19
23+20
24+21
25+22
26+23
27+24
328
4-An Act
5-ENROLLED SENATE
29+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION
30+
31+STATE OF OKLAHOMA
32+
33+2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022)
34+
35+ENGROSSED SENATE
636 BILL NO. 1280 By: Daniels of the Senate
737
838 and
939
1040 Lepak of the House
1141
1242
1343
1444
1545 An Act relating to the Oklahoma Partnership for
1646 School Readiness Board; amending 10 O.S. 2021,
1747 Section 640.1, which relates to membership of the
1848 Board; removing language requiring certain
19-appointments to be made from certain lists; and
20-updating reference.
49+appointments to be made from certain lists; updating
50+reference; providing an effective date; and declaring
51+an emergency.
2152
2253
2354
24-SUBJECT: Oklahoma Partnership for School Readiness Board
55+
2556
2657 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
27-
2858 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 10 O.S. 2021, Section 640.1, is
2959 amended to read as follows:
30-
3160 Section 640.1. A. There is hereby re-created until July 1 ,
3261 2024, in accordance with the Oklaho ma Sunset Law, the Oklahoma
3362 Partnership for School Readiness Board. The Board shall promot e
3463 school readiness supporting community-based efforts to increase the
3564 number of children who are ready to succeed by the time they enter
3665 school. The Board shall additionally serve as the state's Early
3766 Childhood Advisory Council and fulfill the responsibil ities
67+
68+SB1280 HFLR Page 2
69+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
70+2
71+3
72+4
73+5
74+6
75+7
76+8
77+9
78+10
79+11
80+12
81+13
82+14
83+15
84+16
85+17
86+18
87+19
88+20
89+21
90+22
91+23
92+24
93+
3894 described in the Head Start Act of 2007 (PL 110 -134, Section 642B).
3995 The Board shall consist of rep resentatives from the private and
4096 public sectors as follows:
41-
4297 1. Fifteen private sector representatives appointed by the
4398 Governor from a list submitted by an existing private-sector school
4499 readiness initiative that includes in its focus community
45100 mobilization and public engagement activities to include:
46-
47-
48-ENR. S. B. NO. 1280 Page 2
49101 a. two parents of children eight (8) years of age or
50102 younger, and
51-
52103 b. one representative of licensed ch ild care providers;
53-
54104 2. One representative of the licensed child care industry
55105 appointed by the Gover nor from a list submitted by an association
56106 representing the lic ensed child care industry in this state;
57-
58107 3. One representative of a state association of f ederally
59108 funded early childhood programs appointed by the Governor; and
60-
61109 4. To ensure that existing resources are being utilized
62110 effectively, fifteen public sector r epresentatives or their
63111 designees as follows:
64-
65112 a. State Superintendent of Public Instruction ,
66-
67113 b. State Commissioner of Health,
68-
69114 c. Commissioner of the Department of Mental Health and
70115 Substance Abuse Services,
71-
72116 d. Director of the Oklahoma Department of Commerc e,
73-
74117 e. Director of the Oklahoma Department of Libraries,
75118
119+SB1280 HFLR Page 3
120+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
121+2
122+3
123+4
124+5
125+6
126+7
127+8
128+9
129+10
130+11
131+12
132+13
133+14
134+15
135+16
136+17
137+18
138+19
139+20
140+21
141+22
142+23
143+24
144+
76145 f. Director of the Department of Hu man Services,
77-
78146 g. Administrator of the Oklahoma Health Care Authority,
79-
80147 h. Director of the Oklahoma Commission on Children and
81148 Youth,
82-
83149 i. Director of the State Departme nt of Rehabilitation
84150 Services,
85-
86151 j. Executive Director of the Oklahoma Educational
87152 Television Authority,
88-
89153 k. Director of the Oklahoma Department of Career and
90154 Technology Education,
91-
92-ENR. S. B. NO. 1280 Page 3
93-
94155 l. Chancellor of the Oklahoma State Regents for Higher
95156 Education,
96-
97157 m. Cabinet Secretary with responsibility for education
98158 agencies,
99-
100159 n. Dean of the College of Education and Human
101160 Environmental Sciences, Oklahoma State University, and
102-
103161 o. State Director of Head Start Col laboration.
104-
105162 B. Members appointed by the Governor shall serve terms of four
106163 (4) years; provided, of those membe rs initially appointed to the
107164 Board, eight members shall be appointed for two-year terms,
108165 beginning September 1, 2003, and seven members shall b e appointed
109166 for four-year terms, beginning September 1, 2003, as des ignated by
110167 the Governor. The member appointed pursuant to paragraph 2 of
111168 subsection A of this section shall be appointed for an initial term
169+
170+SB1280 HFLR Page 4
171+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
172+2
173+3
174+4
175+5
176+6
177+7
178+8
179+9
180+10
181+11
182+12
183+13
184+14
185+15
186+16
187+17
188+18
189+19
190+20
191+21
192+22
193+23
194+24
195+
112196 to end on August 31, 2007 . The member appointed pursuant to
113197 paragraph 3 of subsection A of this section shall be appointed for
114198 an initial term to end on Augu st 31, 2009. Appointed members shall
115199 continue in office until a successor is appointed by the Governor.
116200 The Governor shall fill all vacancies in the same manner as the
117201 original appointment was made.
118-
119202 C. The Director of the Department of Human Services sh all
120203 convene an organizational meeting of the Ok lahoma Partnership for
121204 School Readiness Board prior to November 1, 2003, at which time
122205 members of the Board shall elect a chair, a vice-chair vice chair,
123206 and other officers as needed. A majority of the member s of the
124207 Board shall constitute a quorum for th e transaction of business.
125-
126208 D. Members of the Board shall receive no compensation for
127209 serving on the Board but shall receive travel reimbursement as
128210 follows:
129-
130211 1. State agency officers and employees who are mem bers of the
131212 Board shall be reimbursed for trave l expenses incurred in the
132213 performance of their duties by their respective agencies in
133214 accordance with the State Travel Reimbursement Act; and
134-
135-
136-ENR. S. B. NO. 1280 Page 4
137215 2. Remaining members shall be reimbursed by the Board from any
138216 funds received by the Board for travel expenses i ncurred in the
139217 performance of their duties in ac cordance with the State Travel
140218 Reimbursement Act.
141219
220+SB1280 HFLR Page 5
221+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
222+2
223+3
224+4
225+5
226+6
227+7
228+8
229+9
230+10
231+11
232+12
233+13
234+14
235+15
236+16
237+17
238+18
239+19
240+20
241+21
242+22
243+23
244+24
245+
142246 E. Members of the Board shall be exempt from the dual -office-
143247 holding provisions of Section 6 of Title 51 of th e Oklahoma
144248 Statutes.
249+SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2022.
250+SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
251+of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
252+declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect an d
253+be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
145254
146-
147-ENR. S. B. NO. 1280 Page 5
148-Passed the Senate the 22nd day of March, 2022.
149-
150-
151-
152- Presiding Officer of the Senate
153-
154-
155-Passed the House of Representatives the 26th day of April, 2022.
156-
157-
158-
159- Presiding Officer of the House
160- of Representatives
161-
162-OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
163-Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________
164-day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
165-By: _______________________________ __
166-Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____
167-day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o 'clock _______ M.
168-
169- _________________________________
170- Governor of the State of Oklahoma
171-
172-
173-OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE
174-Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___
175-day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M .
176-By: _______________________________ __
255+COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 04/18/2022 - DO PASS.