Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022