Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SCs named Rader, Howard, Hall, Jett, Kidd, Montgomery, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|