Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1300 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2022
Bill April 14, 2022