Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Dollens | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Coleman |