Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022