Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Withdrawn from Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from Joint Committee on Administrative Rules committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|