Senate | 05/27/2021 | Died in GCCA | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | SCs named GCCA | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | HAs rejected, conference requested | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Thompson |