Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Amended

Bill April 15, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021