Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck, Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator David
|
|
|