Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1416 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022