Senate | 05/06/2022 | Vetoed 05/06/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Sterling (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Haste |