Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1429 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022