Senate | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jech | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Dills (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rader |