Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021