Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|