Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2022