House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Leewright |