House | 04/12/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jech | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, Russ | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Treat | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Pederson |