Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022