Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Thompson
|
|
|