Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022