Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Wildlife
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Allen
|
|
|