Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022