Senate | 04/20/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Rader |