6 | 36 | | BILL NO. 1601 By: Rader of the Senate |
---|
7 | 37 | | |
---|
8 | 38 | | and |
---|
9 | 39 | | |
---|
10 | 40 | | Bush of the House |
---|
11 | 41 | | |
---|
12 | 42 | | |
---|
13 | 43 | | |
---|
14 | 44 | | |
---|
15 | 45 | | An Act relating to county employee pension funding; |
---|
16 | 46 | | amending 19 O.S. 2021, Sections 954 , 957-1, 960, and |
---|
17 | 47 | | 961, which relate to maximum contributions for |
---|
18 | 48 | | certain entities and payment of certain employer |
---|
19 | 49 | | contributions from court funds ; authorizing a one- |
---|
20 | 50 | | time lump sum contribution in certain circumstances; |
---|
21 | 51 | | modifying amount county and court fund may pay into |
---|
22 | 52 | | county retirement system; modifying l imit of certain |
---|
23 | 53 | | total contribution; deleting obsolete language; |
---|
24 | 54 | | updating statutory reference; clarifying language; |
---|
25 | 55 | | providing an effective date; and declaring an |
---|
26 | 56 | | emergency. |
---|
27 | 57 | | |
---|
28 | 58 | | |
---|
29 | 59 | | |
---|
30 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 106 | | Beginning July 1, 2019, the total employer and employee |
---|
62 | 107 | | contributions shall not exceed eighteen and one -half percent (18.5%) |
---|
63 | 108 | | of the monthly compensation of each member. The governing body of |
---|
64 | 109 | | the participating employers list ed in this section may vary the |
---|
65 | 110 | | percentage contribution of the employer and employee, provided the |
---|
66 | 111 | | total percentage contributed by the employer and employee equals th e |
---|
67 | 112 | | total percentage contribution required by this section. Payment of |
---|
68 | 113 | | such shall be paid t o the fund upon verified claims by the treasurer |
---|
69 | 114 | | of the fund approved by the board of trustees and a ttested by its |
---|
70 | 115 | | clerk. For any contribution made on or after July 1, 2021, to June |
---|
71 | 116 | | 30, 2022, of less than eighteen and one-half percent (18.5%), an |
---|
72 | 117 | | employer may retroactively make a one-time lump sum contribution of |
---|
73 | 118 | | an amount equal to the difference betwee n the actual total |
---|
80 | 150 | | Section 957-1. The county commissioners of any county |
---|
81 | 151 | | establishing a drainage district or districts, and establishing a |
---|
82 | 152 | | county retirement system, in addition to the duties and authority |
---|
83 | 153 | | now provided by law, are hereby authorized to pay into the |
---|
84 | 154 | | retirement system of such coun ty for the use and benefit o f the |
---|
85 | 155 | | employees eligible for retirement benefits, such amounts as the said |
---|
86 | 156 | | board of county commissioners may authorize by resolu tion not |
---|
87 | 157 | | exceeding the current annual salaries of all employees to be covered |
---|
88 | 158 | | in the following perce ntages: |
---|
97 | 162 | | Beginning July 1, 2009, the total employer and em ployee |
---|
98 | 163 | | contributions shall not exceed sixteen and one -half percent (16.5%) |
---|
99 | 164 | | of the monthly compensati on of each member. Provided further, that |
---|
100 | 165 | | drainage district employe es becoming qualified by this act shall be |
---|
101 | 166 | | credited as to eligibility for the full time of their county |
---|
102 | 167 | | employment; and, provided further, in the event of retroactive |
---|
103 | 168 | | eligibility such empl oyees shall be required to p ay into the |
---|
104 | 169 | | retirement system fund an am ount equal to that which would have |
---|
115 | 205 | | Section 960. A. In addition to all other items which are now |
---|
116 | 206 | | or may hereafter be authorized to be paid from the cou rt fund, it |
---|
117 | 207 | | shall be the mandatory duty of the governing board of the court fund |
---|
118 | 208 | | to pay annually for the sole use of the retirement system a sum |
---|
119 | 209 | | equal to the contributions made to the retirement fund by the |
---|
120 | 210 | | employees, but not to exceed the following percentages of the |
---|
121 | 211 | | current annual salaries, established in Section 954 of this title, |
---|
122 | 212 | | of all employees whose salaries are paid eit her in whole or in part |
---|
123 | 213 | | out of the court funds of such county:. |
---|
139 | 250 | | B. It shall be the mandatory duty of the gove rning board of the |
---|
140 | 251 | | court fund to pay annually from the court fund to a county |
---|
141 | 252 | | retirement system which is not a participant in the Oklahoma Public |
---|
142 | 253 | | Employees Retirement System, the employ er's contribution for that |
---|
143 | 254 | | court reporter who pursuant to the provision s of Section 106.8 of |
---|
144 | 255 | | Title 20 of the Oklahoma Statutes , exercised his or her option to |
---|
145 | 256 | | continue as a member of the county retirement system following |
---|
146 | 257 | | January 13, 1969. The contributio ns to be so paid shall be limited |
---|
147 | 258 | | to the amount provided for in subsect ion A of this section. The |
---|
148 | 259 | | provisions of this subsection shall operate retroactively to take |
---|
149 | 260 | | effect on and after January 13, 1969. |
---|
154 | 263 | | Section 961. In addition to all o ther items which are now or |
---|
155 | 264 | | may hereafter be authorized to be paid from the Law Library Fund, it |
---|
156 | 265 | | shall be the mandatory duty of the trustee s of the Law Library Fund |
---|
157 | 266 | | to pay annually for the sole use of the retirement system a sum |
---|
158 | 267 | | equal to the contributions made to the Retirement Fund retirement |
---|
159 | 268 | | fund by the employees, but not to exceed the following percentages |
---|
160 | 269 | | of the current annual salaries , established in Section 954 of this |
---|
161 | 270 | | title, of all employees whose salaries are paid either in whole or |
---|
162 | 271 | | in part out of the Law Library Fund of such county.: |
---|
163 | 272 | | |
---|
185 | | - | |
---|
186 | | - | ENR. S. B. NO. 1601 Page 6 |
---|
187 | | - | Passed the Senate the 22nd day of March, 2022. |
---|
188 | | - | |
---|
189 | | - | |
---|
190 | | - | |
---|
191 | | - | Presiding Officer of the Senate |
---|
192 | | - | |
---|
193 | | - | |
---|
194 | | - | Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of April, 2022. |
---|
195 | | - | |
---|
196 | | - | |
---|
197 | | - | |
---|
198 | | - | Presiding Officer of the House |
---|
199 | | - | of Representatives |
---|
200 | | - | |
---|
201 | | - | OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR |
---|
202 | | - | Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ |
---|
203 | | - | day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. |
---|
204 | | - | By: _______________________________ __ |
---|
205 | | - | Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ |
---|
206 | | - | day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _____ __ o'clock _______ M. |
---|
207 | | - | |
---|
208 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
209 | | - | Governor of the State of Oklahoma |
---|
210 | | - | |
---|
211 | | - | |
---|
212 | | - | OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE |
---|
213 | | - | Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___ |
---|
214 | | - | day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _____ __ M. |
---|
215 | | - | By: _______________________________ __ |
---|
| 314 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON BANKING, FINANCIAL SERVICES AND |
---|
| 315 | + | PENSIONS, dated 04/04/2022 - DO PASS. |
---|