Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1601 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/19/2022

                             
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1601 	By: Rader of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Bush of the House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to county employee pension funding; 
amending 19 O.S. 2021, Sections 954 , 957-1, 960, and 
961, which relate to maximum contributions for 
certain entities and payment of certain employer 
contributions from court funds ; authorizing a one-
time lump sum contribution in certain circumstances; 
modifying amount county and court fund may pay into 
county retirement system; modifying l imit of certain 
total contribution; deleting obsolete language; 
updating statutory reference; clarifying language; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  County employee pension 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     19 O.S. 2021, Section 954, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 954. It shall be the mandatory duty of the board of 
county commissioners of any county esta blishing a retirement fund 
and system to appropriate annually, for the sole use of the 
retirement fund within its general fund and subject to the approval 
of the county excise board, a sum w hich shall be equal to or exceed 
the contributions made to the ret irement fund by the employees.  
Such appropriation shall not exceed the sum of the current annual 
salaries of all employees to be covered in the following 
percentages:   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1601 	Page 2 
 
July 1, 2007 – June 30, 2008 13 1/2% 
 
July 1, 2008 – June 30, 2009 14 1/2% 
 
July 1, 2009 – June 30, 2010 15 1/2% 
 
July 1, 2010 – June 30, 2019 16 1/2% 
 
July 1, 2019 - June 30, 2020 
and each year thereafter 18 1/2% 
 
Beginning July 1, 2019, the total employer and employee 
contributions shall not exceed eighteen and one -half percent (18.5%) 
of the monthly compensation of each member.  The governing body of 
the participating employers list ed in this section may vary the 
percentage contribution of the employer and employee, provided the 
total percentage contributed by the employer and employee equals th e 
total percentage contribution required by this section.  Paymen t of 
such shall be paid t o the fund upon verified claims by the treasurer 
of the fund approved by the board of trustees and a ttested by its 
clerk.  For any contribution made on or after July 1, 2021, to June 
30, 2022, of less than eighteen and one-half percent (18.5%), an 
employer may retroactively make a one-time lump sum contribution of 
an amount equal to the difference betwee n the actual total 
contribution that was made and the total contri bution amount equal 
to eighteen and one-half percent (18.5%). 
 
SECTION 2.    AMENDATORY    19 O.S. 2021, Section 957 -1, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 957-1. The county commissioners of any county 
establishing a drainage district or districts, an d establishing a 
county retirement system, in addition to the duties and authority 
now provided by law, are hereby authorized to pay into the 
retirement system of such coun ty for the use and benefit o f the 
employees eligible for retirement benefits, such a mounts as the said 
board of county commission ers may authorize by resolu tion not 
exceeding the current annual salaries of all employees to be covered 
in the following perce ntages: 
 
July 1, 2009 - June 30, 2010 	15 1/2%   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1601 	Page 3 
 
July 1, 2010 - June 30, 2011 
and each year thereafter 	16 1/2% 
 
Beginning July 1, 2009, the total employer and em ployee 
contributions shall not exceed sixteen and one -half percent (16.5%) 
of the monthly compensati on of each member.  Provided further, that 
drainage district employees becoming qual ified by this act shall be 
credited as to eligibility for the full time of their county 
employment; and, provided further, in the event of retroactive 
eligibility such empl oyees shall be required to p ay into the 
retirement system fund an amount equal to th at which would have 
otherwise been paid by such employees in order to ga in credit for 
such time of employment. whose salaries are paid either in whole or 
in part out of the drainage district funds.  The total employer and 
employee contributions shall not exceed the percentages of the 
monthly compensation of each member set forth in Section 954 of this 
title. 
 
SECTION 3.     AMENDATORY     19 O.S. 2021, Sect ion 960, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 960. A. In addition to all other i tems which are now 
or may hereafter be au thorized to be paid from the cou rt fund, it 
shall be the mandatory duty of the governing board of the court fund 
to pay annually for the sole use of the retirement system a sum 
equal to the contributions made to the retirement fund by the 
employees, but not to exceed the following percentages of the 
current annual salaries, established in Section 954 of this title, 
of all employees whose salaries are paid eit her in whole or in part 
out of the court funds of such coun ty:. 
 
July 1, 2009 - June 30, 2010 	15 1/2% 
 
July 1, 2010 - June 30, 2011 
and each year thereafter 	16 1/2% 
 
Beginning July 1, 2009, the total employer and empl oyee 
contributions shall not exceed sixteen and one-half percent (16.5%) 
of the monthly compensation of each member.  The total employer and 
employee contributions shall not exceed the percentages of the   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1601 	Page 4 
monthly compensation of each member set forth in Sec tion 954 of this 
title. 
 
B. It shall be the mandatory duty of the gove rning board of the 
court fund to pay annually from the court fund to a county 
retirement system which is not a participant in the Oklahoma Public 
Employees Retirement System, the employ er's contribution for that 
court reporter who pursuant to the provision s of Section 106.8 of 
Title 20 of the Oklahoma Statutes , exercised his or her option to 
continue as a member of the county retirement system following 
January 13, 1969.  The contributio ns to be so paid shall be limited 
to the amount provided for in subsect ion A of this section.  The 
provisions of this subsection shall oper ate retroactively to take 
effect on and after January 13, 1969. 
 
SECTION 4.     AMENDATORY     19 O.S. 2021, Section 961, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 961. In addition to all other items whi ch are now or 
may hereafter be autho rized to be paid from the Law Library Fund, it 
shall be the mandatory duty of the trustee s of the Law Library Fund 
to pay annually for the sole use of the retirement system a sum 
equal to the contributions made to the Retirement Fund retirement 
fund by the employees, but not to exceed the following percentages 
of the current annual salaries , established in Section 954 of this 
title, of all employees whose salaries are paid either in whole or 
in part out of the Law Library Fund of such county.: 
 
July 1, 2009 - June 30, 2010 	15 1/2% 
 
July 1, 2010 - June 30, 2011 
and each year thereafter 	16 1/2% 
 
Beginning July 1, 20 09, the total employer and employee 
contributions shall not exceed sixteen and one -half percent (16.5%) 
of the monthly compensation of each member .  The total employer and 
employee contributions shall not exceed the percentages of the 
monthly compensation of each member set forth in Section 954 of this 
title. 
 
SECTION 5.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2022. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1601 	Page 5 
SECTION 6.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1601 	Page 6 
Passed the Senate the 22nd day of March, 2022. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of April, 2022. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _____ __ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _____ __ M. 
By: _______________________________ __