House | 04/13/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Jett |