Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2022