Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|