Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1671 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022