Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Coleman; authored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Luttrell (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|