Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2021