Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|