Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022