Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1760 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022