House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Stanley |