Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman, Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|