Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2021