House | 04/14/2021 | Motion expired | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nollan | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 73 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Pemberton |