Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB258 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/04/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1149 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 258 	By: Rosino 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to aircraft excise tax; amend ing 68 
O.S. 2011, Section 6005, as amende d by Section 1, 
Chapter 347, O.S.L. 2015 (68 O.S. S upp. 2020, Section 
6005), which relates to apportionment of tax revenue; 
deleting obsolete lang uage; modifying apportionment; 
providing an effective date; and decla ring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2011, Section 6005, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 347, O.S.L. 2015 (68 O.S. Supp. 2020, 
Section 6005), is amended t o read as follows: 
Section 6005. A.  For fiscal years beginning prior to July 1, 
1999, all revenues derived pursuant to the provisions of Sections 
6001 through 6007 of this title shall be paid monthly by the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission to the State Treasu rer and placed to the 
credit of the General Revenue Fund to be paid out pursuant to direct 
appropriation by the Legislature. 
B.  1.  For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 1999, fifty 
percent (50%) of all revenues derived pursuant to the provisions of   
 
 
Req. No. 1149 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Sections 6001 through 6007 of this title shall be paid monthly by 
the Tax Commission to the State Treasurer and placed to the credit 
of the General Revenue Fund to be paid out pursuant to direct 
appropriation by the Legislature, and fifty percent (50%) of the 
revenues shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Aeronautics 
Commission Revolving Fund. 
2.  For fiscal year 2001 through fiscal year 2015 For the fiscal 
year beginning July 1, 2021, and all subsequent fiscal years , one 
hundred percent (100%) of the reven ues derived pursuant to the 
provisions of Sections 6001 through 6007 of t his title shall be paid 
monthly by the Tax Commission to the State Treasurer and shall be 
placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Aeronautics Commission 
Revolving Fund. 
3.  For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015, and for each 
fiscal year thereafter, the f irst Four Million Five Hundred Thousand 
Dollars ($4,500,000.00) of the revenues each fiscal year derived 
pursuant to the provisions of Sections 6001 through 6007 of this 
title shall be paid by the Tax Commission to the St ate Treasurer and 
placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Aeronautics Commission 
Revolving Fund, and all such revenues derived each fiscal year in 
excess of Four Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($4,500,000.00) 
shall be paid by the Tax Commission to the State Treasurer and 
placed to the credit of the General Revenue Fund to be paid out 
pursuant to direct appropriation by the Legislature.   
 
 
Req. No. 1149 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediat ely necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and appro val. 
 
58-1-1149 QD 1/4/2021 5:10:39 PM