Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB258 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2022