Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB258 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/07/2022

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB258 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 3, 2022 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL NO. 258 	By: Rosino of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Echols of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
[ aircraft excise tax - apportionment of tax revenue 
- effective date -  
 	emergency ] 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 6005, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6005. A.  For fiscal years beginning prior to July 1, 
1999, all revenues derived pursuant to the provisions of Sections 
6001 through 6007 of this titl e shall be paid monthly by the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission to the State Treasu rer and placed to the 
credit of the General Revenue Fund to be paid out pursuant to direct 
appropriation by the Legislatur e. 
B.  1.  For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 1999, fifty 
percent (50%) of all revenues derived pursuant to the provisions of 
Sections 6001 through 6007 of this title shall be paid monthly by   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB258 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the Tax Commission to the State Treasurer and placed to the c redit 
of the General Revenue Fund to be paid out pursuant to direct 
appropriation by the Legislature, and fifty percent (50%) of the 
revenues shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Aeronautics 
Commission Revolving Fund. 
2.  For fiscal year 2001 thro ugh fiscal year 2015 For the fiscal 
year beginning July 1, 2022, and all subsequent fiscal years , one 
hundred percent (100%) of the reven ues derived pursuant to the 
provisions of Sections 6001 through 6007 of t his title shall be paid 
monthly by the Oklahoma Tax Commission to the State Treasurer and 
shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Aeronautics Commission 
Revolving Fund. 
3.  For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015, and for each 
fiscal year thereafter, the f irst Four Million Five Hundred Thousa nd 
Dollars ($4,500,000.00) of the revenues each fiscal year derived 
pursuant to the provisions of Sections 6001 through 6007 of this 
title shall be paid by the Tax Commission to the St ate Treasurer and 
placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Aeronautics Commi ssion 
Revolving Fund, and all such revenues derived each fis cal year in 
excess of Four Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($4,500,000.00) 
shall be paid by the Tax Commission to the State Treasurer and 
placed to the credit of the General Revenue Fund to be paid out 
pursuant to direct appropriation by the Legislat ure. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2022.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB258 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereo f this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
March 3, 2022 - DO PASS AS AMENDED