Senate | 05/02/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Simpson |