Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 11, 2021

Amended

Bill April 15, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021