Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dobrinski
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|