Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB310 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021