Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|